U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00073
  • Case Name: McGovern v. Caplinger
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • March 14, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.