U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00342
  • Case Name: Dembele v. Goodwin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • April 07, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • April 07, 2025: [Assent to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 04, 2025: [Rescheduling Motion Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.