U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00331
  • Case Name: Staples et al v. Governor, NH, State of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 28, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 28, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 27, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 19, 2025: [Discovery]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 17, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.