U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Gonzalez v. Newrez LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 28, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 15, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Return of Service Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • March 18, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • March 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.