U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00470
  • Case Name: Fisher v. Southern New Hampshire Medical Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.