U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00071
  • Case Name: Coburn v. Manchester, NH, City of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.