U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00362
  • Case Name: Odabasi v. US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Rescheduling Motion Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.