U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00108
  • Case Name: Burger v. Harper
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [More Definite Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Return of Service Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • March 27, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons-Waiver - Request for Issuance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Complaint - New Case]
  • March 21, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.