U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Vigilant Insurance Company v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • April 28, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 08, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.