U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00326
  • Case Name: Ortolano v. Bolton et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • April 15, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [In Chambers Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Objection not to motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 08, 2025: [Objection not to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 07, 2025: [Objection not to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 04, 2025: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • April 04, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • April 04, 2025: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • April 03, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Disqualify]
  • April 02, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Objection not to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Objection not to motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 31, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Excuse]
  • March 28, 2025: [Excuse]
  • March 28, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 27, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.