U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00119
  • Case Name: Hassell v. Derby et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Addendum]
  • May 06, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • May 01, 2025: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Cure Notice - Action Requested]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 30, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 30, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Return of Service Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • March 31, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.