U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Robie v. Walmart Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • April 30, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 30, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 30, 2025: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [State Court Record]
  • April 09, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • April 03, 2025: [Case Opening Error]
  • April 03, 2025: [Case Assigned]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.