U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00015
  • Case Name: USA v. Greenview Associates, L.P. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • May 01, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 28, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.