U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Sanipatin v. US Attorney General et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2025: [Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA]
  • April 28, 2025: [Return of Service Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 16, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Conference Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 14, 2025: [Clerk Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
  • April 02, 2025: [Transfer Case Procedural Order In]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • April 02, 2025: [Case Assigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.