U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00129
  • Case Name: Zenner v. New London Hospital Association, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 09, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • April 07, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [State Court Record]
  • April 04, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.