U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00132
  • Case Name: Bennett v. Buzzard et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 08, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 07, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • April 09, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • April 07, 2025: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.