U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00110
  • Case Name: Moore v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • May 07, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 16, 2025: [Clerk Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Directing Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Complete Application or Fee Paid]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.