U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Adams v. Sig Sauer, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • April 10, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.