U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Liu v. Noem et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 01, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 29, 2025: [Addendum]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 23, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 21, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 09, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Addendum]
  • April 08, 2025: [Addendum]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • April 07, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • April 07, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.