U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00149
  • Case Name: American Foods, LLC v. GKI Foods, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 09, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 08, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 08, 2025: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • May 02, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [State Court Record]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 21, 2025: [Assent to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • April 18, 2025: [Case Opening Error]
  • April 18, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.