U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00156
  • Case Name: Pasula et al v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • May 07, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exceed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Exceed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Addendum]
  • April 18, 2025: [Exceed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certify Class]
  • April 18, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • April 18, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.