U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mc-00044
  • Case Name: In Re Subpoena on BAE Systems, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 07, 2025: [Seal Document-Court Use]
  • May 06, 2025: [Leave to File]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 30, 2025: [Seal Document-Court Use]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • April 21, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extend Time]
  • April 21, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.