U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00163
  • Case Name: LeBlanc v. AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • May 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • April 24, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • April 24, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.