U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00166
  • Case Name: Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTone LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: [State Court Record]
  • April 29, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • April 29, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 28, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.