open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00137-1
    Party Name:USA v. Reynoso
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Exhibits]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Notes]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Court's Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Appointment]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Order]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?410442
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =