open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00111
    Party Name:Rodriguez v. Amtrak et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Cure Defects]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?412451
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =