open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00346
    Party Name:Fullerton et al v. Energen Resources Corporation
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Cure Defects]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?417303
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =