open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00445
    Party Name:Lucero v. City of Clovis Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?418742
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =