open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00446
    Party Name:Nicholson v. Gulino
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appendix/Supplement]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?418747
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =