open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00419
    Party Name:Ammons et al v. Sentry Insurance
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmittal State Court Documents]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?418402
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =