open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00450
    Party Name:Franklin v. Horton et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Cure Defects]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for 2254 Relief]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?418835
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =