open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00541
    Party Name:Jiron et al v. Roth et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend (other)]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?420802
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =