open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00620
    Party Name:Lucero v. CoreCivic, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?423722
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =