open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00629
    Party Name:Pruess v. Presbyterian Health Plan, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?424239
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =