open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:19-11876-t7
    Party Name:Cesar Orduno and Ashley Orduno
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Final Decree (Auto)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Discharging Debtor (Order) autodisc]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Digital Audio file]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Reaffirmation (Order on Motion)]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Minutes of Hearing - CHAP (text-only)]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Hearing (Notice) - BNC Notice with select recipients]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Reaffirmation (Motion for Approval)]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Additional Parties of Bankruptcy Case Filing (Notice)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Amendment to Bankruptcy Schedules (Notice)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds (341 filings)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Terminate Deadline]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Order on Application)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Receipt of Installment Payment]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Form 119)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Add Party]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Set Case Flag to Pro Se]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?166158
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =