open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:19-11878-t13
    Party Name:Paul Neil Dorsett
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Modify Plan (Motion)]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Generic Document]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Interim Report - Ch 13 (batch)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Appearance of Child Support Creditor (Notice)]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Compensation (Order on Application)]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Change of Responsible Attorney (Notice)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management - Ch 13 (Notice)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objections (Notice)]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Compensation (Application)]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Order)]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Confirmation]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [341 Chapter 13 - Concluded]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objs to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (Notice)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [ Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Signature Page]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [none]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?166160
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =