open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00741
    Party Name:Smith v. University of New Mexico et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Cure Defects]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?427489
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =