open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00831
    Party Name:Savich v. Liberty Mutual Insurance et al.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?430215
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =