open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00805
    Party Name:Villela et al v. Bernalillo County et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Staying Case]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Intervene]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?429530
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =