open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00842
    Party Name:Conway v. Jag Transportation, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Service]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appendix/Supplement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?430488
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =