open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00945
    Party Name:Dixon v. Stone Truck Line, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Staying Discovery]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Hearing]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Crossclaim]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?433369
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =