open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:19-12339-j7
    Party Name:Raymond Garcia and Lucinda Garcia
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Deadline to File Objections (Notice - with Forms)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Dismiss Case (Trustee/UST Motion)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Order on Application)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:October 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Receipt of Installment Payment]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Credit Counseling Received: No Certificates]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Form 119)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Deficient Filing (Notice)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Add Party]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Set Case Flag to Pro Se]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?166639
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =