open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:19-12336-t7
    Party Name:Rodney L Bell
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds (341 filings)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:October 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Deficient Filing (Notice)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Deadline to File Objections (Notice)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Stay (Motion for Relief)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [none]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?166636
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =