open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:2:19-cr-03779-1
    Party Name:USA v. Lopez-Cortes
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?433690
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =