open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:2:19-cr-03778-1
    Party Name:USA v. Jimenez-Camacho
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?433688
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =