open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00957
    Party Name:Heuskin v. D&E Transport, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:May 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend (other)]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmittal State Court Documents]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?433717
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =