open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00958
    Party Name:Dominguez v. Family Dollar Stores of New Mexico, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Submit Closing Document]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?433748
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =