open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:19-12345-j7
    Party Name:Vassily G. Macepura and Charlotte Macepura
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Receipt of Installment Payment]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Terminate Deadline]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Order on Application)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [none]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Electronically Paid Installment Payment (Ch 7)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:October 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Signature Page]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?166645
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =