open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:19-12344-t7
    Party Name:Carri Jo Rael
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Final Decree (Auto)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Abandon (Order) (when combined with order on relief from stay)]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Relief from Stay (Order)]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Discharging Debtor (Order) autodisc]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Deadline to File Objections (Notice)]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Abandonment of Property (Motion to Compel) (filed with motion for relief from stay)]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Stay (Motion for Relief)]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds (341 filings)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:October 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [none]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Signature Page]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?166644
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =