open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01115
    Party Name:Aranda v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?438483
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =